Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0268
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405 /CH0311
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 /CH0290
Title
Transfer Tax - Transfers by Governmental Entities
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Ways and Means
1/17/2019 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0268 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1405 /CH0311 Howard County - Transfer Tax - Collection by Director of Finance Ho. Co. 30-19 Howard County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Ways and Means
3/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0780 /CH0290 Transfer Tax - Transfers by Governmental Entities Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2019 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM