Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0510)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Vessel Excise Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Transfer of Unsalvageable Boat
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873
Title
Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163 (SB0795)
Title
Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0826)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0225
Title
Tax Liens - Expiration
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510 (HB0636)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1163)
Title
Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB1291)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0408 Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 (SB0510) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0872 Vessel Excise Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Transfer of Unsalvageable Boat Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1163 (SB0795) Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0826) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0359 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0225 Tax Liens - Expiration Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0510 (HB0636) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0795 (HB1163) Income and Property Taxes - Qualified Maryland Opportunity Zone Investments Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB1291) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM