Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 (SB0631/CH0510)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax Rate
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036
Title
Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on Nonresidents
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631 /CH0510 (HB0815)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0815 (SB0631/CH0510) Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax Rate Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Additional Tax on Nonresidents Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0631 /CH0510 (HB0815) Hotel Rental Tax - Exemption - Lodging at a Corporate Training Center Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM