Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 /CH0491
Title
Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170)
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 /CH0491 Charles County - School Construction Excise Tax Rates Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 491
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0209 Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2016
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0916 Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1170 (SB0637/CH0188) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0637 /CH0188 (HB1170) Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax Revenue Distribution - Annual Reports Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM