Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278 (SB0415)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 (SB0466)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 /CH0216 (SB0499/CH0215)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407
Title
Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0415 (HB0278)
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 (HB0601)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499 /CH0215 (HB1227/CH0216)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 (SB0415) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0601 (SB0466) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 /CH0216 (SB0499/CH0215) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1407 Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0415 (HB0278) Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
SB0466 (HB0601) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 /CH0215 (HB1227/CH0216) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM