Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1624 (SB0764/CH0472)
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0764 /CH0472 (HB1624)
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1192
Title
Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1225
Title
Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0549 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Baltimore City – Tax Sales of Real Property – Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act) Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1624 (SB0764/CH0472) Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0764 /CH0472 (HB1624) Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1192 Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1225 Anne Arundel County - Short-Term Residential Rentals - Taxation and Regulation Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM