Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 /CH0593 (SB0216/CH0594)
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 /CH0607 (SB0466/CH0608)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0216 /CH0594 (HB0244/CH0593)
Title
Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 /CH0608 (HB0285/CH0607)
Title
Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 /CH0593 (SB0216/CH0594) Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 /CH0607 (SB0466/CH0608) Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0369 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Agricultural Tourism Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0216 /CH0594 (HB0244/CH0593) Garrett County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 594
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0466 /CH0608 (HB0285/CH0607) Hotel Rental Tax - Limitation of Municipal Authority to Tax Small Hotels - Repeal Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM