Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047 /CH0089 (SB0820/CH0088)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0303 (SB0212/CH0302)
Title
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 /CH0091 (SB0819/CH0090)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1254 (SB0630)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0302 (HB0173/CH0303)
Title
Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1254)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0819 /CH0090 (HB0729/CH0091)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 /CH0089 (SB0820/CH0088) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D Beer, Wine, and Liquor and Class 9 Limited Distillery Licenses Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0173 /CH0303 (SB0212/CH0302) Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 /CH0091 (SB0819/CH0090) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1254 (SB0630) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
SB0212 /CH0302 (HB0173/CH0303) Baltimore Metropolitan Council - Queen Anne's County - Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1254) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0819 /CH0090 (HB0729/CH0091) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM