Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0475 /CH0056 (SB0427/CH0057)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0513 (SB1002)
Title
County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056 /CH0058 (SB0636/CH0059)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Queen Anne's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 /CH0057 (HB0475/CH0056)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcohol Awareness Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636 /CH0059 (HB1056/CH0058)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB0513)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0475 /CH0056 (SB0427/CH0057) Queen Anne's County - Alcohol Awareness Program Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0513 (SB1002) County Boards of Education – Establishing Regional Career and Technology Education Schools – Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 /CH0058 (SB0636/CH0059) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County Queen Anne's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0427 /CH0057 (HB0475/CH0056) Queen Anne's County - Alcohol Awareness Program Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 /CH0059 (HB1056/CH0058) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Queen Anne's County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2019 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1002 (HB0513) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority and Funding Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM