Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304 (SB0326)
Title
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0298)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0761
Title
State Highway Administration - Privatization of Rest Areas and Welcome Centers on State Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale of Naming Rights to State Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1508
Title
Montgomery County - Highway Construction and Maintenance - Maryland Route 410 in Takoma Park
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - U.S. Route 15
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0298 (HB0593)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326 (HB0304)
Title
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805
Title
Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842
Title
State Highway and Road Construction - Forward-Funded Projects - Reimbursement of Political Subdivisions
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0304 (SB0326) Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 (SB0298) Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68 Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0760 Maryland Transportation Authority - Privatization of the Intercounty Connector and the I-95 Express Toll Lanes Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0761 State Highway Administration - Privatization of Rest Areas and Welcome Centers on State Highways Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 State Highway Administration - Sale of Naming Rights to State Highways Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway Funds Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1508 Montgomery County - Highway Construction and Maintenance - Maryland Route 410 in Takoma Park Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0015 Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - U.S. Route 15 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0093 Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study for a Third Span Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Finance
1/23/2013 - 2:30 PM
SB0132 Cecil-Harford Highway Impact Revenue Account Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0298 (HB0593) Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68 Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 (HB0304) Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 State Highway and Road Construction - Forward-Funded Projects - Reimbursement of Political Subdivisions Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB1048 Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page