Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0015
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0083
Title
Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0591)
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0545
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 (SB0656)
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 (SB0377)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920
Title
State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1153
Title
State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202
Title
Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled Aggregate
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450)
Title
State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0639)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0484)
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0621)
Title
State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682
Title
Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053)
Title
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0015 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0214 Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount Plans Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0286 /CH0083 Calvert and St. Mary's Counties - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0450 (SB0371/CH0028) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Delegate Carr 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0466 /CH0053 (SB0802/CH0052) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0484 (SB0591) Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0545 State Highway Administration - Highway Work Permittees - Notice of Sidewalk Closure Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0621 (SB0656) State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 (SB0377) Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Multiple Axle Vehicles - Toll Rates Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0762 State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of Costs Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1153 State Highway Administration - Signs Along State Highways - Public Libraries Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1202 Highway Construction and Maintenance - Use of Recycled Aggregate Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0275 Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0028 (HB0450) State Highway Administration - Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Areas Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB0639) Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 (HB0484) Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0621) State Highway Administration - Entrance to State Highway - Permit Process Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0802 /CH0052 (HB0466/CH0053) Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM