Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 (SB0843)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645
Title
Criminal Law - Disruption of Highway Usage - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649 (SB0362)
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Revenue and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Transportation - I-270 and I-495 - Prohibition on Adding New Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705
Title
Transportation – I–270 and I–495 – Prohibition on Toll Lanes (Stop Unnecessary Toll Lanes Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
State Highways – Designations – Thurgood Marshall Highway
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1329 (SB0541)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1373 (SB0960)
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Highways – Designations – President Barack Obama Highway
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 (HB0649)
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387
Title
Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - No Toll Payment Required
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 (HB1329)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB0067)
Title
I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1373)
Title
Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 (SB0843) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
Finance
HB0645 Criminal Law - Disruption of Highway Usage - Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0649 (SB0362) Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Revenue and Distribution Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0703 Transportation - I-270 and I-495 - Prohibition on Adding New Lanes Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0705 Transportation – I–270 and I–495 – Prohibition on Toll Lanes (Stop Unnecessary Toll Lanes Act of 2021) Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB1147 Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1297 State Highways – Designations – Thurgood Marshall Highway Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1329 (SB0541) Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1373 (SB0960) Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0026 State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 State Highways – Designations – President Barack Obama Highway Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 (HB0649) Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0387 Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - No Toll Payment Required Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 (HB1329) Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0843 (HB0067) I-495 and I-270 Public-Private Partnership - Partnership Agreement - Requirements (Maryland Department of Transportation Promises Act of 2021) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Finance
SB0960 (HB1373) Highways - Public-Private Partnerships - Cultural Preservation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/08/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/6/2021 12:42 PM
Click to return on the top page