Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation - Generally (R2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0238
Title
Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0408
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Account Maintenance Charge - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546
Title
Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 (SB0377)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913 /CH0286
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government Reporting - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0181
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0377 (HB0639)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0379
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 /CH0370
Title
Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0238 Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air Navigation Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0357 Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0408 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Account Maintenance Charge - Prohibition Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0546 Maryland Transit Administration Oversight and Planning Board Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 (SB0377) Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0913 /CH0286 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Local Government Reporting - Revisions Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State Employees Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0181 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased Restoration Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0377 (HB0639) Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0379 Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0600 /CH0370 Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - Funding Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM