Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733
Title
Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum Sentence
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0244 (SB0710)
Title
Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014
Title
Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015 /CH0631
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286 (SB0777)
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0017
Title
Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
Drunk Driving - Mandatory Participation in Educational Program
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB0957/CH0244)
Title
Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB1286)
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0733 Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum Sentence Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 /CH0244 (SB0710) Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1014 Criminal Procedure - Preliminary Breath Test - Evidence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 /CH0631 Drunk Driving - Transporting a Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 (SB0777) Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0087 /CH0017 Drunk Driving - Ignition Interlock System Program - Repeat Offenders Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0094 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0213 Drunk Driving - Mandatory Participation in Educational Program Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 (HB0957/CH0244) Impaired Driving - Repeat Offenders - Penalties Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0777 (HB1286) Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM