Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444 (SB0873)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB0943)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415
Title
Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0176
Title
Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 /CH0018
Title
Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0873 (HB0444)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB1392)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0444 (SB0873) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and Inspections Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0682 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0693 Vehicle Laws - Seat Belts and Child Safety Seats Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Vehicle Laws - Equipment - Prohibition on Counterfeit Airbags and Substandard Airbags Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0886 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB0943) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 Vehicle Laws - Former School Vehicles - Rules of the Road and Equipment Delegate Myers 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
SB0072 /CH0176 Motor Vehicles - Damage to Highways from Overweight or Oversized Vehicles - Liability and Penalties Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0073 /CH0018 Vehicle Laws - Piling, Poles, Mill Logs, and Similar Cargo - Length, Overhang, and Fastening Standards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0873 (HB0444) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Alternate Tests and Inspections Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0943 (HB1392) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Decentralization - Study Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax - Prohibited Acts Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM