Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046
Title
Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load Signals
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 /CH0186 (SB0475/CH0187)
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0543
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0646 /CH0494 (SB1069/CH0495)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory Signs
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1403
Title
Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543
Title
Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1605
Title
Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1714
Title
Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0363
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0475 /CH0187 (HB0106/CH0186)
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069 /CH0495 (HB0646/CH0494)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load Signals Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0106 /CH0186 (SB0475/CH0187) Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles Delegate Busch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0123 Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0253 /CH0543 Motor Vehicles - Automobile Transporters Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0316 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0646 /CH0494 (SB1069/CH0495) Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products Delegate Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1164 Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Motor Vehicles - School Vehicles - Flashing Advisory Signs Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1403 Motor Vehicles – Failure to Use Seat Belts – Penalties Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 Tow Trucks – Driver Safety Act Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1605 Task Force on Maryland Student Transportation Safety Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1714 Vehicle Laws - Police Vehicles - Use of Cruise or Directional Marker Lights Delegate Mosby 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0363 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0475 /CH0187 (HB0106/CH0186) Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1069 /CH0495 (HB0646/CH0494) Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM