Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0282)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429
Title
Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act
Sponsor
Environment and Transportation Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899
Title
Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Extension - Out-of-State Students
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1401 /CH0254
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 (HB0032)
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0126
Title
Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 /CH0255
Title
Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 (SB0282) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
HB0052 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 Tow Trucks - Driver Safety Act Environment and Transportation Committee 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0899 Biennial Motor Vehicle Safety and Equipment Inspections - Required Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0915 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Extension - Out-of-State Students Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0939 /CH0063 (SB0935/CH0064) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1286 School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts - Pilot Program Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1401 /CH0254 Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0282 (HB0032) Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Prohibition on Suspension or Revocation of Registration Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0592 /CH0126 Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road Senator Serafini 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 /CH0064 (HB0939/CH0063) Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1038 /CH0255 Vehicle Laws – Overweight Vehicles – Heavy Weight Port Corridor Permit Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM