Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 /CH0068
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0154 /CH0083
Title
Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0158 /CH0086
Title
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1215
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Data - Ownership and Use
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481
Title
Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0331
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 /CH0068 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Deployed Military Personnel - Exemption Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 68
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0154 /CH0083 Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 83
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0158 /CH0086 Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections - Standards and Requirements Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 86
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0486 Corporal William Kyle Ferrell Emergency Vehicle Safety Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1215 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions - Vehicles With Low Annual Mileage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Historic Motor Vehicles - Exemption From Emissions Inspections - Limitation Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1464 Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Data - Ownership and Use Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 Zero-Emission Electric School Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1505 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0331 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0566 Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Inspection Requirement Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:09 PM