Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031 (SB0272/CH0151)
Title
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133 (SB0159)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0591
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unauthorized Use of Rented Motor Vehicle - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0392
Title
Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0440 /CH0268 (SB0058/CH0267)
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0682 (SB0545)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 (SB0662)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0882 /CH0241
Title
Motor Vehicles - Low Speed Vehicles - Power Source
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Multiple Copies of Driving Records - Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1397
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Notice Regarding Authorized Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0267 (HB0440/CH0268)
Title
Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0274
Title
Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0159 (HB0133)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 /CH0151 (HB0031)
Title
Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545 (HB0682)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0730)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 (SB0272/CH0151) Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law) Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0133 (SB0159) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 /CH0591 Vehicle Laws - Unauthorized Use of Rented Motor Vehicle - Repeal Delegate Anderson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 591
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0250 /CH0392 Vehicle Laws - Definition of "Bicycle" - Mopeds Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0376 Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Unlawful Vehicles Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0440 /CH0268 (SB0058/CH0267) Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0538 Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0682 (SB0545) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0730 (SB0662) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0882 /CH0241 Motor Vehicles - Low Speed Vehicles - Power Source Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Law Enforcement Procedures - Traffic Stops and Safety Checkpoints Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 Motor Vehicle Administration - Multiple Copies of Driving Records - Fees Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1397 Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Notice Regarding Authorized Drivers Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1467 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0058 /CH0267 (HB0440/CH0268) Education - School Vehicles - Authorized Riders Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0088 /CH0274 Department of Transportation - Special Bonds and Borrowing - Revenue-Backed Bonds Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0159 (HB0133) Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0272 /CH0151 (HB0031) Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law) Senator Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0545 (HB0682) Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Records - Expungement Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 (HB0730) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM