Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0126)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0347
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0041)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679
Title
Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0688
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817
Title
Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Repeal of Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0447 (SB0888/CH0446)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922 /CH0408 (SB0579/CH0407)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0751)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1518 (SB1122)
Title
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1588
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1641
Title
Vehicle Laws - Proof of Insurance for Motor Vehicles Registered in Another State
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036
Title
Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized Removal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0348)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0008)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579 /CH0407 (HB0922/CH0408)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 (HB1172)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 /CH0446 (HB0912/CH0447)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1122 (HB1518)
Title
Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0126) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0347 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 (SB0041) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized Removal Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0688 Vehicle Laws - Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device - Definition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 Unlawful Use of Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Repeal of Administrative Penalties Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 /CH0447 (SB0888/CH0446) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0922 /CH0408 (SB0579/CH0407) Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1172 (SB0751) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1518 (SB1122) Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - Penalty Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1588 Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1641 Vehicle Laws - Proof of Insurance for Motor Vehicles Registered in Another State Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0036 Vehicle Laws - Cats and Dogs Left Unattended - Authorized Removal Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0348) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0008) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0183 School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0579 /CH0407 (HB0922/CH0408) Vehicle Laws - Application - Park Model Recreational Vehicles - Definition Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0751 (HB1172) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0888 /CH0446 (HB0912/CH0447) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be Insured Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1122 (HB1518) Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Failure to Carry Required Security - Penalty Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM