Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0301 /CH0625 (SB0417/CH0626)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 /CH0470
Title
Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702 (SB0501)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1072 /CH0226 (SB0701)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1180
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1207
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243 (SB0805)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0492
Title
School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331
Title
Public Utilities - Electric Vehicle Charging Station Infrastructure - Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0014
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0247 /CH0258
Title
Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0417 /CH0626 (HB0301/CH0625)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0501 (HB0702)
Title
Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0603
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB1072/CH0226)
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1243)
Title
Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Vehicle Infrastructure - Prior Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0301 /CH0625 (SB0417/CH0626) Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0393 /CH0470 Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0702 (SB0501) Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 /CH0471 (SB0436/CH0472) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1072 /CH0226 (SB0701) Transportation Network Companies - Insurance Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Economic Matters
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1180 Maryland Energy Administration - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicle Rebate Program Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1207 Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 (SB0805) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies – Nonvisual Access Delegate Attar 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1255 /CH0492 School Bus Transition – Zero–Emission Vehicles – Grant Program and Fund Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Ways and Means
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 Public Utilities - Electric Vehicle Charging Station Infrastructure - Task Force Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0014 Vehicle Laws - Personal Electric Transportation Devices - Definitions Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0247 /CH0258 Rental and Replacement Vehicles - Age-Based Service Determinations - Prohibition Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 258
Finance
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0417 /CH0626 (HB0301/CH0625) Vehicle Laws – Race–Based Traffic Stops – Policy and Reporting Requirements Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 626
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0436 /CH0472 (HB1003/CH0471) Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Security Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0462 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0501 (HB0702) Washington County - Abandoned Vehicles - Regulation by Local Authority Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0603 Vehicle Laws - Mobile Carrying Device - Definition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0701 (HB1072/CH0226) Transportation Network Companies - Insurance Senator Kramer 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0805 (HB1243) Motor and Electric Scooter Sharing Companies - Nonvisual Access - Workgroup Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0998 Public Service Commission - Electric Vehicle Infrastructure - Prior Authorization Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM