Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rabies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0089
Title
Health - Reports Relating to Dog Bites - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0371
Title
Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1124 /CH0199
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1204
Title
Public Health - Dog Bites - Proof of Rabies Vaccination Required
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 /CH0198
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0089 Health - Reports Relating to Dog Bites - Required Information Delegate Tarrant 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0371 Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1124 /CH0199 Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1204 Public Health - Dog Bites - Proof of Rabies Vaccination Required Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 /CH0198 Criminal Law - Possession of Dangerous or Wild Animals Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM