Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1143
Title
Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1503
Title
Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858
Title
State Racing Commission - Ejections from Race Tracks - Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0078
Title
Horse Racing - Special Takeout
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009
Title
Special Thoroughbred Racing - State Fair Society - Racing Days
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 /CH0425 (SB0127) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1143 Gaming - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Pimlico Historic Preservation Commission Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1503 Horse Racing - Purse Dedication Account - Annual Grant to Fair Hill Delegate Rudolph 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0127 (HB0102/CH0425) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0858 State Racing Commission - Ejections from Race Tracks - Appeals Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0961 /CH0078 Horse Racing - Special Takeout Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 Special Thoroughbred Racing - State Fair Society - Racing Days Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM