Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256 (SB0294/CH0052)
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426 (SB1080)
Title
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0294 /CH0052 (HB0256)
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434)
Title
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1026
Title
Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1080 (HB1426)
Title
Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0256 (SB0294/CH0052) Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0988 /CH0434 (SB0527) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Ways and Means Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 (SB1080) Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0294 /CH0052 (HB0256) Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 (HB0988/CH0434) Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1026 Maryland State Fair - Funding Extension Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB1080 (HB1426) Harness Racing - Purses - Deductions Paid to an Organization Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM