Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0481 (SB0578)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0655)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977 (SB0708)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989
Title
Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1657 (SB1166)
Title
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606)
Title
Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0452
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0481)
Title
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB0895)
Title
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0977)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1166 (HB1657)
Title
State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event
Sponsor
Senator Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0152 /CH0023 (SB0172) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0481 (SB0578) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0606 (SB0178/CH0500) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Fair Hill Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0895 (SB0655) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0977 (SB0708) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0989 Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Study and Implementation Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1657 (SB1166) State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0172 (HB0152/CH0023) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0500 (HB0606) Horse Racing - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Eligibility and Capital Expenditures Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0452 Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Senator Salling 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0481) State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and Costs Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0655 (HB0895) Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support Payments Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 (HB0977) Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Fair Hill Race Course Cecil County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB1166 (HB1657) State Designations - The Preakness Stakes as the State Cultural Event Senator Oaks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM