Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 /CH0642 (SB0309/CH0643)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0673)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 (SB0883)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070 (SB0878)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Sports Wagering Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 (SB0800)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339)
Title
Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309 /CH0643 (HB0374/CH0642)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 (HB0643)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds – Racetrack Facility Renewal Account – Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1190)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0878 (HB1070)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0990)
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0080 /CH0339 (SB0132) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Ways and Means
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0374 /CH0642 (SB0309/CH0643) Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 642
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0643 (SB0673) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Rosapepe)
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0990 (SB0883) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 (SB0878) Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1132 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Sports Wagering Operations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 (SB0800) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Delegate Glenn 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0132 (HB0080/CH0339) Horse Racing at Fair Hill - Union Hospital Allocation - Repeal Cecil County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 /CH0643 (HB0374/CH0642) Anne Arundel County – Alcoholic Beverages – Racetrack and Racetrack Concessionaire Licenses Senator Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 643
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0673 (HB0643) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds – Racetrack Facility Renewal Account – Racecourse at Timonium Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1190) Maryland Stadium Authority’s Pimlico Race Course Study Workgroup Senator Hayes 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0878 (HB1070) Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0990) Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Use of Funds Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM