Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Radiation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0410)
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859
Title
State Board of Physicians - Radiographers, Radiation Therapists, and Nuclear Medicine Technologists - Requirements for Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB0310)
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 (SB0172/CH0464) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 (SB0410) Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0859 State Board of Physicians - Radiographers, Radiation Therapists, and Nuclear Medicine Technologists - Requirements for Licensing Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0410 (HB0310) Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM
Click to return on the top page