Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Radiation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0152)
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683
Title
Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services and Computed Tomography Scan Services - Patient Referrals
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0944 (SB0539)
Title
Patient Referrals - Oncologists - Radiation Therapy Services and Nondiagnostic Computer Tomography Scan Services
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 (HB0056)
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205
Title
Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574)
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0944)
Title
Patient Referrals - Oncologists - Radiation Therapy Services and Nondiagnostic Computer Tomography Scan Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0152) Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0449/CH0034) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0683 Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services and Computed Tomography Scan Services - Patient Referrals Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0944 (SB0539) Patient Referrals - Oncologists - Radiation Therapy Services and Nondiagnostic Computer Tomography Scan Services Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 (HB0056) Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0205 Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0449 /CH0034 (HB0574) State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0539 (HB0944) Patient Referrals - Oncologists - Radiation Therapy Services and Nondiagnostic Computer Tomography Scan Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM