Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Radio

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM