Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Raffles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundation Affiliated With Professional Football Team PG 303-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0195
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0329 /CH0097 (SB0615) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundation Affiliated With Professional Football Team PG 303-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0195 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 (HB0329/CH0097) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM