Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Raffles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294
Title
Election Law - Contributions - Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0598 /CH0099
Title
Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundations PG 301-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0118
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 /CH0173
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095)
Title
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0294 Election Law - Contributions - Disclosure Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0322 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0558 /CH0095 (SB0515) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0598 /CH0099 Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundations PG 301-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 /CH0118 State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - Authorized Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 /CH0173 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 (HB0558/CH0095) Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion Raffles Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM