Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184 (SB0847)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1432 /CH0684
Title
Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 /CH0685
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0847 (HB1184)
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1184 (SB0847) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Transportation Infrastructure Bank Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1432 /CH0684 Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1433 /CH0685 Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0847 (HB1184) Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM