Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 (SB0841)
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 (SB0842)
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 /CH0238
Title
Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073
Title
Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0841 (HB0069)
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842 (HB0184)
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 (SB0841) Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 (SB0842) St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0300 /CH0238 Department of Transportation - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Services - Utilization Study Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1073 Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention Study Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1138 Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0841 (HB0069) Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0842 (HB0184) St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM