Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092 (SB0275)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0434
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0763)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0891 (SB1035)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0966)
Title
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of Frederick
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1338
Title
Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 Corridor
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1434
Title
Rail Safety Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598 (SB1120)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0092)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0041
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Article
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0731
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Aberdeen B&O Railroad Station
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0735)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 (HB1023)
Title
Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of Frederick
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035 (HB0891)
Title
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1120 (HB1598)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 St. Mary's County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
HB0092 (SB0275) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0434 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2016 - 2:30 PM
HB0612 Manslaughter by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Under the Influence or Impaired - Penalty Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0763) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0891 (SB1035) Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - Repeal Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 (SB0966) Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From Shady Grove to the City of Frederick Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1338 Transportation - Transit Improvements - Interstate 270 Corridor Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1434 Rail Safety Act of 2016 Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1598 (SB1120) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0275 (HB0092) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0724 /CH0041 Alcoholic Beverages Article President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0731 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Aberdeen B&O Railroad Station Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 AM
SB0763 (HB0735) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 (HB1023) Task Force to Study Extending Metrorail Service From the City of Gaithersburg to the City of Frederick Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 (HB0891) Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery Rate Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB1120 (HB1598) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM