Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0033 (SB0076)
Title
Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063 (SB0188)
Title
State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685 (SB0107)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Labor and Employment - Right to Work
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 (HB0033)
Title
Climate Crisis and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091
Title
Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0685)
Title
Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0188 (HB0063)
Title
State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869
Title
Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0033 (SB0076) Climate Crisis and Education Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0063 (SB0188) State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0492 Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 11:00 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
HB0622 Prince George’s County – Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Prince George’s County Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) PG 406–21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0685 (SB0107) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0704 Land Use – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Siting (Maryland Stop the Maglev Act of 2021) Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1168 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1321 Labor and Employment - Right to Work Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0076 (HB0033) Climate Crisis and Education Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0091 Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Operator - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 (HB0685) Labor and Employment - Secure Maryland Wage Act Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0188 (HB0063) State Finance – Prohibited Appropriations – Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 Statewide Transit Plan – Western Maryland MARC Rail Extension Study Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/17/2021 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page