Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0229)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038 (SB0655)
Title
Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of Terms
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 /CH0441
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0820)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1098
Title
Housing Discrimination - Source of Income
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 (SB0212/CH0474)
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322 (SB0755)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1471
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Registration of Residential Rental Property Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Stocksdale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1529 (SB1095)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0259)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 /CH0474 (HB1265)
Title
Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0412)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 (HB1038)
Title
Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of Terms
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB1322)
Title
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1080)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1095 (HB1529)
Title
Real Property - Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0079
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0412 (SB0229) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1038 (SB0655) Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of Terms Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1043 /CH0441 Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 (SB0820) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1098 Housing Discrimination - Source of Income Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 (SB0212/CH0474) Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014 Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 (SB0755) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1471 State Real Estate Commission - Registration of Residential Rental Property Managers Delegate Stocksdale 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1529 (SB1095) Real Property - Ground Rents Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0025 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0207 (HB0259) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 /CH0474 (HB1265) Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014 Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0229 (HB0412) Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0655 (HB1038) Real Property - Requirements for New Home Sales Contracts - Clarification of Terms Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 (HB1322) Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and Study Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 (HB1080) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1095 (HB1529) Real Property - Ground Rents Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1106 /CH0079 Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM