Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140 /CH0252
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser Trainees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0728)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0760 /CH0350
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Duties and Obligations
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB0172)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0140 /CH0252 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser Trainees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 (SB0728) Home Act of 2017 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0760 /CH0350 State Real Estate Commission - Real Estate Brokerage Services - Duties and Obligations Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0970 Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1184 Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - Reductions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 /CH0267 (HB0202/CH0268) State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement Exemption Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0520 State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB0172) Home Act of 2017 Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM