Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094 (SB0152)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178
Title
Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0530)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263
Title
Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Phase Out Company Giveaways Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1006
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1277
Title
University of Maryland – Harford Memorial Hospital Closure – Economic Impact Study
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 (SB0350)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education Requirements - Ethics and Professionalism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1521
Title
Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117
Title
Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0132
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 (HB0094)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0350 (HB1446)
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0231)
Title
Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 (SB0152) Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0178 Real Property – Required Notices for Contracts of Sale – Zones of Dewatering Influence Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 (SB0530) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 Real Property - Sales of Mobile Home Parks - Notice Requirements Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0279 Real Property - Restrictions on Use - Low-Impact Landscaping Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0458 Family Law - Minors - Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act of 2020) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0525 Phase Out Company Giveaways Act Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0825 Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0826 Howard County – Residential Property and New Home Construction Advertisements – School District Information Ho. Co. 02–20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0929 State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1006 Real Estate Brokers - Exemption for Auctioneers - Repeal Delegate Miller 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1277 University of Maryland – Harford Memorial Hospital Closure – Economic Impact Study Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1446 (SB0350) State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education Requirements - Ethics and Professionalism Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1521 Howard County - Sales of Residential Real Property - Notice of School District Boundary Changes Ho. Co. 04-20 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0006 State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/09/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0023 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0117 Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0132 Property Tax - Assessment Reviews - Aids in Reviewing Property Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 (HB0094) Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0350 (HB1446) State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0231) Housing Opportunities Made Equal Act Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 11:21 AM