Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0413 (SB0010)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832 (SB0361)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199
Title
Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0240)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010 (HB0413)
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0240 (HB1269)
Title
Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361 (HB0832)
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713
Title
Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st Century
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0233 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0236 Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of Map Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0413 (SB0010) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 (SB0361) Congressional Districting Process Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1199 Citizens' Congressional Redistricting Commission Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0240) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0010 (HB0413) Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0240 (HB1269) Task Force to Study Redistricting in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 (HB0832) Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0713 Task Force on Democracy and Representative Government in Maryland for the 21st Century Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM