Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427
Title
Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0428
Title
Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0610
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 (SB0448)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921
Title
House Legislative Districts - Single Member
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 (HB0850)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards and Process
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0267 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0428 Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - Establishment Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0610 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 (SB0448) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 House Legislative Districts - Single Member Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 Congressional Districting Process Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0448 (HB0850) Congressional Districts - Standards and Process Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM