Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 (SB0090)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044 (SB0091)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0463 (SB0110)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724
Title
Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1048
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0744
Title
Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 (SB1050)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003
Title
Redistricting - Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 (HB0043)
Title
Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 (HB0044)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 (HB0463)
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195)
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1430)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 (SB0090) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0044 (SB0091) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0323 /CH0195 (SB0336/CH0194) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0463 (SB0110) Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0039/CH0074) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Delegate Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0724 Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act of 2019) Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1048 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0744 Howard County - School Facilities Surcharge - Rates Ho. Co. 03-19 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 744
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1430 (SB1050) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HJ0003 Redistricting - Congressional Districts - Standards Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0039 /CH0074 (HB0528) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 74
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0090 (HB0043) Elections - Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment - Commission and Process President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 (HB0044) Legislative and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0110 (HB0463) Congressional Districts - Standards Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 /CH0194 (HB0323/CH0195) Somerset County - Commissioners - Residency Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1050 (HB1430) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM