Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 (SB0204)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0266)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346 (SB0284)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818
Title
Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958
Title
Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1422
Title
Public Schools - Redistricting - Community Advisory Committees For Student Assignment
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1431 (SB0967)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1460
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1491
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts)
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495
Title
Legislative Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 (HB0182)
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0341)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0346)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2020
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1431)
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 (SB0204) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0341 (SB0266) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0346 (SB0284) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0818 Redistricting and Apportionment - Population Count - Citizenship Status Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0825 Montgomery County - Residential Property Advertisements and Sales - School District Information MC 20-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0958 Legislative Districts - Single-Member Delegate Districts (One Person One Vote Act) Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1422 Public Schools - Redistricting - Community Advisory Committees For Student Assignment Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1431 (SB0967) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1460 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1491 Congressional Districts - Standards (Anti-Gerrymandering of Maryland's Congressional Districts) Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB1495 Legislative Districts - Standards Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0204 (HB0182) Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0266 (HB0341) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 – Constitutional Amendment President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 (HB0346) Redistricting Reform Act of 2020 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 (HB1431) Legislative and Congressional Districts – Criteria and Open Hearing Process (Fair Maps Act) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 3:56 PM