Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reclamation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0613 /CH0624
Title
Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504)
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0568
Title
Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0504 (SB0370/CH0463) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0613 /CH0624 Sustainable Communities - Designation and Financing Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0370 /CH0463 (HB0504) Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion Systems Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463
Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0854 /CH0568 Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM