Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0059
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0940
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1043 /CH0441
Title
Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1045 /CH0634
Title
Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1310
Title
Recordation Tax - Home Equity Loan Modifications - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0129
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0141 /CH0471
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1003
Title
Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0059 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0940 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1043 /CH0441 Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1045 /CH0634 Real Property - Lien Priority of Refinance Mortgages - Escrow Costs Delegate Arora 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1310 Recordation Tax - Home Equity Loan Modifications - Exemption Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0129 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0141 /CH0471 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Nonpayment of Environmental Citations Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1003 Business Regulation - Pet Cemeteries - Establishment and Operational Requirements Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM