Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0052 (SB0065)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0063)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 (SB0101)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 /CH0448
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1129 (SB0837)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0063 (HB0053)
Title
Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065 (HB0052)
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312)
Title
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 (HB0186)
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent Recordings
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837 (HB1129)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440)
Title
St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 /CH0057 (SB0062) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0051 /CH0487 (SB0066) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0052 (SB0065) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0053 (SB0063) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0186 (SB0101) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 (SB0077/CH0008) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Appointed Attorneys Program Corporation Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 /CH0440 (SB0840) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0675 /CH0448 Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency Judgment Delegate Knotts 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1129 (SB0837) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1144 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0062 (HB0049/CH0057) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Water and Sewer Lien Registers - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0063 (HB0053) Real Property - Manufactured Homes - Recording of Affidavits of Affixation and Severance - Fees Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0065 (HB0052) Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - Repeal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0066 (HB0051/CH0487) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0008 (HB0312) Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing Statements Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0101 (HB0186) Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer-on-Death (TOD) Act Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 Real Property - Land Records - Fraudulent Recordings Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0837 (HB1129) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB0600/CH0440) St. Mary's County - Property Maintenance - Voluntary Agreements Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM