Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488 /CH0487
Title
Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0508 (SB0330)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0762
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 /CH0653
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 (HB0508)
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396)
Title
Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398)
Title
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566)
Title
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 /CH0602
Title
Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 /CH0487 Property Tax - Property Transferred to New Owner - Appeals Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0508 (SB0330) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0576 /CH0398 (SB0525/CH0399) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0762 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0920 /CH0396 (SB0509/CH0395) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0970 /CH0566 (SB0591/CH0565) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Delegate Reznik 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1446 /CH0653 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - Prohibitions Delegate McComas 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0330 (HB0508) Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of Writing Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0456 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Budget and Taxation
SB0509 /CH0395 (HB0920/CH0396) Real Property - Actions to Quiet Title Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/06/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0525 /CH0399 (HB0576/CH0398) Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - Clarification Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0591 /CH0565 (HB0970/CH0566) Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association Fees Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 /CH0602 Task Force to Study Recording Deeds for Victims of Domestic Violence Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM