Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 /CH0538
Title
Recordation and Transfer Tax - Principal Residence Surrendered in Bankruptcy - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0520 (SB0376/CH0521)
Title
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 (SB0747)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520)
Title
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0939)
Title
State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803
Title
Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 /CH0553 (SB0137/CH0554) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 553
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2017 - 3:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0469 /CH0538 Recordation and Transfer Tax - Principal Residence Surrendered in Bankruptcy - Exemption Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 /CH0520 (SB0376/CH0521) Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0939 (SB0747) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - Enforcement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0137 /CH0554 (HB0165/CH0553) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0376 /CH0521 (HB0595/CH0520) Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to Recording Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 521
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0747 (HB0939) State Government - Acknowledgments, Oaths, and Affirmations - Recordations and Notarizations Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 Frederick County - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM