Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0465 /CH0268
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0264 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0465 /CH0268 State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM