Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordings -see also- Video

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166
Title
Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video Recordings
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 (SB0785)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 /CH0113
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0825
Title
Public Service Commission - Hearings and Proceedings - Video and Audio Recordings
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0929
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938
Title
Transit Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436 (SB0967)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Warning
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0067 /CH0017
Title
Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068
Title
Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Assurance
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB0251)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 (HB1436)
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video Recordings Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0251 (SB0785) Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0420 /CH0113 Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0825 Public Service Commission - Hearings and Proceedings - Video and Audio Recordings Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0929 Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Local Jurisdictions Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0938 Transit Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and Modifications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1436 (SB0967) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1465 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Warning Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0067 /CH0017 Central Collection Unit - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Control Purposes Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0068 Comptroller - Monitoring and Recording of Telephone Calls - Training and Quality Assurance Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0182 Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - Prohibition Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Enforcement Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 (HB0251) Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 (HB1436) Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras Required Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1048 Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil Penalties Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM