Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordings -see also- Video

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0504
Title
Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0620
Title
Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0482/CH0128)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744 /CH0453
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0566)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0968)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129)
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0457 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or Witness Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0504 Telephone Communications Consumer Protection Act Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0620 Crimes - Unmanned Aircraft Systems - Unauthorized Surveillance Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0482/CH0128) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Cameras Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0744 /CH0453 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - "Mug Shot" Web Sites Delegate Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Economic Matters
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 (SB0566) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0482 /CH0128 (HB0627) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0968) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Alterations Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129) Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM